EP0954671 - VENETIAN BLIND STRUCTURE, DOUBLE GLAZED WINDOW UNIT AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING THE VENETIAN BLIND STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3916723 Canada Inc. 12345-A, boul. Metropolitain est Montreal, Quebec H1B 5R3 / CA | [2002/06] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Unicel Architectural Inc. 12 345 Boul. Métropolitain Est Montreal, Quebec H1B 5R3 / CA | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Arcon Canada Limitée 12 345 Boul. Métropolitain Est Montreal, Quebec H1B 5R3 / CA | ||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Arcon Canada Inc. 12 345 Boul. Métropolitain Est Montreal, Quebec H1B 5R3 / CA | ||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states UNICEL INC. 88, rue de Vaudreuil Boucherville Québec J4B 5G4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY, Fernand 405, rue Vanier Brossard, Quebéc J4W, 1Y1 / CA | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul, et al Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Metz, Paul, et al CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96937146.7 | 12.11.1996 | [1999/45] | WO1996CA00742 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718377 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954671 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954671 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/264 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
E06B9/264 (EP,US);
E06B9/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | JALOUSIE, DOPPELT VERGLASTES FENSTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN DER JALOUSIE | [1999/45] | English: | VENETIAN BLIND STRUCTURE, DOUBLE GLAZED WINDOW UNIT AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING THE VENETIAN BLIND STRUCTURE | [1999/45] | French: | STORE A LAMELLES, FENETRE A DOUBLES VITRAGES ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE DU STORE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3702040 (ROY FERNAND)[A] 1-13; | [A]EP0345007 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [A] 1-13; | [A]EP0589496 (BERTI SRL [IT]) [A] 1-13 |