EP0858651 - ACTIVE ACOUSTIC ATTENUATION DEVICE FOR USE IN A DUCT, PARTICULARLY FOR SOUNDPROOFING A VENTILATION AND/OR AIR-CONDITIONING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNOFIRST Parc Technologique et Industriel de Napollon, 399, avenue des Templiers 13670 Aubagne / FR | For all designated states ALDES AERAULIQUE 20, boulevard Joliot Curie 69200 Venissieux Cedex / FR | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARME, Christian Le Brasilia 35, boulevard Barral F-13008 Marseille / FR | 02 /
DELEMOTTE, Virginie 43, rue Pierre-Dupré F-13008 Marseille / FR | 03 /
CHAFFOIS, Pierre 99, rue Pierre-Brunier F-69300 Caluire / FR | 04 /
DAMIZET, Patrick 25, rue Marcel-Pagnol F-69200 Vénissieux / FR | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96937355.4 | 29.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996FR01694 | Priority number, date | FR19950012802 | 30.10.1995 Original published format: FR 9512802 | [1998/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716816 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858651 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858651 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
G10K11/17857 (EP,US);
G10K11/17861 (EP,US);
G10K11/17881 (EP,US);
G10K2210/104 (EP,US);
G10K2210/112 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3027 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Title | German: | AKTIVE AKUSTISCHE DÄMPFUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR ANORDNUNG INNERHALB EINES ROHRES,INSBESONDERE ZUR SCHALLDÄMPFUNG EINES BELÜFTUNGS- UND/ODER KLIMANETZWERKS | [1999/24] | English: | ACTIVE ACOUSTIC ATTENUATION DEVICE FOR USE IN A DUCT, PARTICULARLY FOR SOUNDPROOFING A VENTILATION AND/OR AIR-CONDITIONING NETWORK | [1998/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATTENUATION ACOUSTIQUE ACTIVE DESTINE A ETRE DISPOSE A L'INTERIEUR D'UN CONDUIT, EN PARTICULIER POUR L'INSONORISATION DE RESEAU DE VENTILATION ET/OU DE CLIMATISATION | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/34] | AKTIVE AKUSTISCHE DAMPFUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR ANORDNUNG INNERHALB EINES ROHRES,INSBESONDER ZUR SCHALLDÄMPFUNG EINER BELUFTUNGS- UND/ODER KLIMANETZ | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.1999 | GR | 16.06.1999 | IE | 16.06.1999 | DK | 16.09.1999 | PT | 16.09.1999 | LU | 29.10.1999 | BE | 31.10.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 16.06.1999 | |
GR | 16.06.1999 | ||
IE | 16.06.1999 | ||
DK | 16.09.1999 | ||
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 16.06.1999 | |
GR | 16.06.1999 | ||
IE | 16.06.1999 | ||
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 16.06.1999 | |
GR | 16.06.1999 | ||
IE | 16.06.1999 | ||
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 16.06.1999 | |
IE | 16.06.1999 | ||
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 16.06.1999 | |
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 16.06.1999 | |
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 16.06.1999 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2275722 (SOUND ATTENUATORS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-10,18 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 26 * * page 7, line 1 - line 19; figures 2,7,8 *; | [XY]GB1456018 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1-3 * page 9, line 30 - line 51; figure 10 * [Y] 14-17; | [Y]US4665549 (ERIKSSON LARRY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,18 * column 4, line 20 - column 40; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US4783817 (HAMADA HAREO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]WO9508820 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [A] 17 * figure 7 *; | [Y]WO9519075 (BOLT BERANEK & NEWMAN [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * figures 1-6,12 *; | [AP]US5511127 (WARNAKA GLENN E [US]) [AP] 3,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 18; figures 2-5 * * column 6, line 52 - line 65 ** column 7, line 8 - line 28 * | by applicant | FR2275722 | US4665549 | US4876722 | FR19810022406 | FR19830013502 |