EP0858325 - STABLE FREEZE-DRIED PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75635 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOULOUMIE, Colette, Bâtiment 5 Résidence Le Golf, 421, rue Croix-de-Las-Cazes F-34000 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
BREUL, Thierry Bâtiment A, 72, avenue de Louisville F-34080 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
COLLIERE, Laurence La Bayssade F-82700 Montbartier / FR | 04 /
FAURE, Philippe 48, rue Saint-Baudile F-34970 Maurin / FR | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/14] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1998/34] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96937367.9 | 30.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996FR01706 | Priority number, date | FR19950013022 | 03.11.1995 Original published format: FR 9513022 | [1998/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717064 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858325 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858325 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/19, A61K9/14, A61K47/26, A61K47/18 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/18 (KR);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Extension states | LT | 27.04.1998 | LV | 27.04.1998 | SI | 27.04.1998 | Title | German: | LYOPHILISIERTE STABILE PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNG | [1998/34] | English: | STABLE FREEZE-DRIED PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION | [1998/34] | French: | FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE LYOPHILISEE STABLE | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Request for further processing for: | 02.11.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5088215 ; | [A]JPH0296536 ; | [A]GB2021581 (WELLCOME FOUND) [A] 1-12 * page 3; example 1 *; | [A]US4537883 (ALEXANDER ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5 - column 6; table 1 *; | [A]EP0394045 (ERBAMONT INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 44 - line 51 *; | [X]WO9323017 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC [US]) [X] 1,7 * page 7, line 26 - line 34 * * page 13; example 2 *; | [T]EP0682944 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [T] 1-8* claim 1 *; | [A] - TSUNAKAWA N. ET AL, "Freeze drying of panthetine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19751201), vol. 83, no. 22, Database accession no. 183393, XP002009310 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 52, Database accession no. 75-85480w, & JPS5088215 A 19750715 (DAICHI PHARM. KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 20, Database accession no. 90-151822, XP002009311 & JPH0296536 A 19900409 (GREEN CROSS CORP.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900626), vol. 14, no. 294, Database accession no. (C - 732), & JP02096536 A 19900409 (GREEN CROSS CORP.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |