EP0858697 - COMPUTERIZED PAYMENT SYSTEM FOR PURCHASING GOODS AND SERVICES ON THE INTERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PayPal, Inc. 303 Bryant Street Mountain View, California 94041 / US | [2005/47] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Doubleclick Inc. 450 West 33rd Street New York, NY 10001 / US | ||
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states FIRST VIRTUAL HOLDINGS, INC. Suite 300, 11975 El Camino Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Marshall, T. 420 Whisman Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
STEIN, Lee, H. 17435 Los Morros Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 03 /
BORENSTEIN, Nathaniel, S. 1724 Shadford Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | 04 /
LOWERY, Carlyn, M. 508 Second Street Petaluma, CA 94952 / US | 05 /
NEW, Darren 13911 Durango Drive Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 06 /
STEFFERUD, Einar 17301 Drey Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [1998/34] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96937866.0 | 30.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996US17556 | Priority number, date | US19950548305 | 01.11.1995 Original published format: US 548305 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716897 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858697 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07F19/00, H04K1/00 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/027 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/0855 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/425 (EP,US);
H04L9/3226 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Title | German: | COMPUTERGESTEUERTES ZAHLUNGSSYSTEM ZUM ANKAUF VON GÜTERN UND DIENSTLEISTUNGEN ÜBER DAS INTERNET | [1998/34] | English: | COMPUTERIZED PAYMENT SYSTEM FOR PURCHASING GOODS AND SERVICES ON THE INTERNET | [1998/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE PAIEMENT INFORMATISE POUR L'ACHAT DE BIENS ET DE SERVICES SUR INTERNET | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 25.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/50] | 28.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/50] | Appeal following examination | 20.07.2007 | Appeal received No. T1903/07 | 02.10.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.10.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9516971 (OPEN MARKET INC [US]) [Y] 1-13,18,24-27 * page 20, line 3 - line 16 *; | [PA]WO9608783 (FIRST VIRTUAL HOLDINGS INC [US]) [PA] 1-13,18,24-27 * page 13, line 3 - page 14, line 21 * * page 19, line 34 - page 21, line 16 * * figures 1,5,10 *; | [A]US5329589 (FRASER ALEXANDER G [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 8, line 5 - column 9, line 55; figure 4 * | [Y] - "FIRST VIRTUAL(TM) INTERNET PAYMENT SYSTEM", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, (199411), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 17 - 21, XP002128491 [Y] 1-13,18,24-27 * Section "Example of practical usage of the NII", 2nd and 3rd paragraph * | [X] - COX B ET AL, "NETBILL SECURITY AND TRANSACTION PROTOCOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WORKSHOP OF ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, XX, XX, (19950711), pages 77 - 88, XP000579446 [X] 22 * page 77 - page 82 * * page 86 - page 87; figure 1 * | [PA] - ALAIN PLAMONDON, "Paiement électronique: Entreprise privée: First Virtual Internet Payment System", LE PAIEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE SUR INTERNET, (19961005), pages 1 - 4, URL: www.rambit.qc.ca/plamondon/fv.htm, (20020226), XP002191458 [PA] 1-13,18,24-27 * Section "Principe" * | International search | [XE]US5590197 (CHEN JAMES F [US], et al); | [X]US5329589 (FRASER ALEXANDER G [US], et al); | [A]US5283829 (ANDERSON MILTON M [US]); | [A]US4947028 (GOROG JONATHAN M [US]); | [A]US5420926 (LOW STEVEN H [US], et al); | [A]US5291554 (MORALES FERNANDO [US]); | [A]US4799156 (SHAVIT EYAL [US], et al); | [AP]US5557518 (ROSEN SHOLOM S [US]) | [X] - Press Release for "CARI" and "Frequently Asked Questions About CARI", 10 April 1995, see FAQ *18. | [X] - THE NETBILL ELECTRONIC COMMERCE PROJECT, 15 May 1995; Sections Entitled, "The NetBill Transaction Protocol" and "NetBill Costs and Interaction with Financial Institutions" and SANTO, B. Bill Paying put on Line, Electronic Engineering Times, No. 849, page 82, 20 March 1995. | [X] - The GlobeID Payment System, Spring 1994 (3 pages). | by applicant | WO9608783 |