EP0859873 - PROCESS FOR REMOVING TIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states DONCASTERS Precision Castings-Bochum GmbH Bessemerstrasse 80 44793 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states DONCASTERS Precision Castings-Bochum GmbH Bessemerstrasse 80 44793 Bochum / DE | |||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states TFB Feingusswerk Bochum GmbH Bessemerstrasse 80 44793 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGER, Robert Rudelsweiherstrasse 49b D-91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KRUG, Peter Am Steig 4 D-90427 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
ESSER, Winfried Am geraden Weg 39 D-44805 Bochum / DE | 04 /
EWALD, Jürgen Dornenkamp 7 D-45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 05 /
PREUHS, Jürgen Nohlstrasse 82 D-46045 Oberhausen / DE | 06 /
DONNER, Adolf Dahlhauser Höhe 44a D-44879 Bochum / DE | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/18] | Zedlitz, Peter, et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/35] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96938019.5 | 16.10.1996 | [1998/35] | WO1996DE01962 | Priority number, date | DE1995138440 | 16.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19538440 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714823 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859873 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859873 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/44, C22B25/06 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
C22B25/06 (EP,US);
C23F1/44 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON ZINN | [1998/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVING TIN | [1998/35] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE L'ETAIN | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR410901 (GUSTAV SPITZ [AT]) [X] 1-7,10-12 * page 1, column L, line 6 - column R, line 54 * * page 1, column L, line 6 - page 1, column R, line 54 * [Y] 8; | [Y]US4164542 (DEREN PINCUS [US]) [Y] 8 * claim 1 *; | [X]DE1583870 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES) [X] 1,9 * claims 1,2,4 *; | [X]DE325973 (JOHN BILLWILLER DIPL ING) [X] 1-5,7,10-12 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR584789 (PHILIPPE E.V.); | [A]CH108307 (MARINO QUINTIN [BE]); | [A]GB2012815 (METAL BOX CO LTD) | Examination | GB190700527 | - GMELIN INSTITUT: "GMELINS Handbuch der anorganischen Chemie, System Nummer 46, Lieferung B, Seiten 364-365", 1971, VERLAG CHEMIE, WEINHEIM |