EP0861424 - INFRARED RADIATION THERMOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Kronberg / DE | [1999/50] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JESTÄDT, Albrecht Talstrasse 56 D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 02 /
BÜLTGES, Heinz Im Hirtengarten 18 D-65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
BEERWERTH, Frank Emsstrasse 1 D-65594 Runkel-Ennerich / DE | [1998/36] | Application number, filing date | 96938175.5 | 12.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996EP04933 | Priority number, date | DE1995143096 | 18.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19543096 | [1998/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719332 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861424 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861424 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/04, G01K1/08, A61B5/00 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
G01J5/04 (EP,US);
G01J5/02 (EP);
G01J5/021 (EP,US);
G01J5/025 (EP,US);
G01J5/026 (EP,US);
G01J5/049 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/36] | Title | German: | INFRAROT-STRAHLUNGSTHERMOMETER | [1998/36] | English: | INFRARED RADIATION THERMOMETER | [1998/36] | French: | THERMOMETRE A RAYONNEMENT INFRAROUGE | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.10.2001 | IE | 04.10.2001 | AT | 12.11.2001 | LU | 12.11.2001 | MC | 12.11.2001 | BE | 30.11.2001 | CH | 30.11.2001 | LI | 30.11.2001 | PT | 04.01.2002 | SE | 04.01.2002 | GR | 05.01.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 12.11.2001 | ||
LU | 12.11.2001 | ||
MC | 12.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
AT | 12.11.2001 | ||
MC | 12.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 12.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 12.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 12.11.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
MC | 12.11.2001 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 04.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0024717 (TRUNZ THOMAS) [A] 1,5-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 18 *; | [Y]EP0445784 (IVAC CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,7-9 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 12 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 11 *; | [A]EP0472490 (THERMOSCAN INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 46 *; | [A]EP0502277 (PAT O DAILY REVOCABLE TRUST [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract ** column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 18 *; | [AD]US5169235 (TOMINAGA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - line 47 *; | [AD]EP0565123 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [AD] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 15 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 4 *; | [Y]WO9500067 (INFRA TEMP INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,7-9 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 33 * * page 6, line 14 - line 24 * * page 8, line 3 - line 15 * * page 12, line 6 - line 15 * |