EP0804715 - SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING A PHOTOGRAPH TOGETHER WITH A PERTINENT MAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | ||
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY LIMITED 6-1, 2-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKUNI, Shin 3-16-1, Gonokami Hamura-shi Tokyo 205 / JP | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96938451.0 | 13.11.1996 | [1997/45] | WO1996JP03322 | Priority number, date | JP19950319792 | 15.11.1995 Original published format: JP 31979295 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718440 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804715 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804715 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
G01C21/3647 (EP,US);
G01C21/3602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESYSTEM FÜR FOTO UND ZUGEHÖRIGE KARTE | [1997/45] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING A PHOTOGRAPH TOGETHER WITH A PERTINENT MAP | [1997/45] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE D'UNE PHOTOGRAPHIE AVEC UNE CARTE CORRESPONDANTE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.01.2003 | FI | 29.01.2003 | IT | 29.01.2003 | LI | 29.01.2003 | NL | 29.01.2003 | SE | 29.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 29.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4939662 (NIMURA MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,10,15,18,19 * column 4, line 23 - line 35 *; | [X]WO9008371 (COLES CHRISTOPHER FRANCIS [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10,15,16,18,19 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 17; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH05224599 ; | [A]US5296884 (HONDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - line 36 * * column 6, line 23 - line 38 *; | [A]WO9507526 (CRITICOM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 15, line 25 - page 17, line 35 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931210), vol. 017, no. 673, Database accession no. (P - 1658), & JP05224599 A 19930903 (KENWOOD CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |