EP0867191 - DRUG COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Yoshimi 9-4, Ohiwa 4-chome Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 420 / JP | 02 /
SHIOZAWA, Hiroyoshi 15-4, Surugadai 3-chome Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426 / JP | 03 /
KISHIMOTO, Hideyuki 1-34, Higashi-cho Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426 / JP | 04 /
SETOGUCHI, Yoichi 8-32, Aoba-cho 4-chome Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426 / JP | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Geering, Keith Edwin REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96938540.0 | 26.11.1996 | [1998/40] | WO1996JP03450 | Priority number, date | JP19950307512 | 27.11.1995 Original published format: JP 30751295 | [1998/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719699 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867191 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/415, A61K31/34, A61K31/425 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
A61K33/08 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/08, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/08, A61K31/34 (US,EP);
A61K33/08, A61K31/415 (US,EP);
A61K33/08, A61K31/425 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/40] | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1998/40] | English: | DRUG COMPOSITION | [1998/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MEDICAMENT | [1998/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1998 | Translation filed | 15.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59210012 ; | [A]US4605551 (BUEHLER JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 56; examples 1-4; claims 1-8 *; | [X]EP0600725 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * examples I-V; claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO9516446 (NIPPON GLAXO LIMITED [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, lines 17-21; claims 1-10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850403), vol. 009, no. 074, Database accession no. (C - 273), & JP59210012 A 19841128 (TAKEDA YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]EP0286781 (HEUMANN PHARMA GMBH & CO [DE]) |