EP0886863 - ASSEMBLY OF A NUMBER OF PLATE-SHAPED DATA CARRIERS AND A STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fountain Technologies B.V. i.o. Rivium Quadrant 94 2909 LC Capelle a/d IJssel / NL | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Montan Nederland B.V. Oud Loodsdrechtsedijk 135 1231 LT Loosdrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEILIGERS, Joannes, Hermanus Oud Loosdrechtsedijk 135 NL-1231 LT Loosdrecht / NL | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 96938551.7 | 20.11.1996 | [1999/01] | WO1996NL00459 | Priority number, date | NL19951001698 | 20.11.1995 Original published format: NL 1001698 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720315 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886863 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886863 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/04 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G11B33/0422 (EP,US);
G11B33/0444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Extension states | AL | 25.05.1998 | LT | 25.05.1998 | LV | 25.05.1998 | RO | 25.05.1998 | SI | 25.05.1998 | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE VIELZAHL PLATTENFÖRMIGER DATENTRÄGER UND AUFBEWAHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1999/01] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF A NUMBER OF PLATE-SHAPED DATA CARRIERS AND A STORAGE DEVICE | [1999/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONSTITUE DE PLUSIEURS SUPPORTS D'INFORMATION EN FORME DE PLATEAUX ET D'UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01204536.5 / EP1205935 | EP99202092.5 / EP0961280 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.02.2000 | GR | 02.02.2000 | DK | 02.05.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/46] | FI | 02.02.2000 | |
DK | 02.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 02.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2154550 (MARDON ILLINGWORTH) [X] 1-5,8-13 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0420350 (PHILIPS & DU PONT OPTICAL [NL], et al) [DA] 1* column A; figure 4 *; | [X]DE9215426U (SUN HING AUDIO EQUIPMENT MFY. LTD.) [X] 1-6,8-13 * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0608822 (LUCKOW HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 50; figures 9,10 * |