EP0865302 - INHALATOR DESIGNED TO PROVIDE MULTIPLE DOSES OF A DRY PHARMACOLOGICAL POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAGO RESEARCH AG Eptingerstrasse 51 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | [2000/26] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states JAGO PHARMA AG Eptingerstrasse 51 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Manfred Hegegasse 7 D-79189 Bad Krozingen / DE | 02 /
EGGIMANN, Thomas Mühleweg 41 CH-4133 Pratteln / CH | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Heinen, Detlef Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Heinen, Detlef BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/35] | Heinen, Detlef c/o A.Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1998/39] | Ullrich, Gerhard, Dr. A. Braun, Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 96938904.8 | 05.12.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996CH00430 | Priority number, date | CH19950003463 | 07.12.1995 Original published format: CH 346395 | [1998/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720589 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865302 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865302 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M11/002 (EP,US);
A61M15/0025 (EP,US);
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/0068 (EP,US);
A61M15/0076 (EP,US);
A61M15/008 (EP,US);
G06M1/163 (EP,US);
A61M15/0091 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | INHALATOR ZUR MEHRFACHEN DOSISWEISEN ABGABE EINES PHARMAKOLOGISCHEN TROCKENPULVERS | [1998/39] | English: | INHALATOR DESIGNED TO PROVIDE MULTIPLE DOSES OF A DRY PHARMACOLOGICAL POWDER | [1998/39] | French: | INHALATEUR FOURNISSANT DES DOSES MULTIPLES D'UNE POUDRE SECHE PHARMACOLOGIQUE | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99123089.7 / EP0995457 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 31.08.2000 | [2001/16] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0547429 (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE]) [A] 1,28,32 * abstract * * column 14, line 38 - column 15, line 29 *; | [A]GB2262452 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | WO9321982 [ ] (UNIV NEW YORK [US]); | [A]WO9405359 (NORTON HEALTHCARE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,32 * abstract * * page 5, line 25 - page 12, line 26 *; | [A]WO9416756 (MIRIS MEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,29,32 * abstract * * page 20, line 5 - page 25, line 16 *; | [A]FR2701653 (VALOIS [FR]) [A] 1,23,24,26,28,32 * abstract * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 34 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 22 *; | [A]US5490502 (RAPOPORT DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,32 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - line 30 * * column 5, line 51 - line 67 * * column 11, line 51 - column 12, line 44 * |