EP0862518 - HYDROPHILIZED SUPPORT FOR PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES AND ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states HORSELL GRAPHIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED Howley Park Estate, Morley Leeds, West Yorkshire LS27 0QT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAMBRA, Harjit, Singh 90 Carr Manor Avenue Moortown Leeds LS17 5BW / GB | 02 /
ORGAN, Robert, Michael "Rainbow" 24 Churchward Close Grove Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 0QZ / GB | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1998/37] | Brierley, Anthony Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 96939199.4 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/37] | WO1996GB02883 | Priority number, date | GB19950024134 | 24.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9524134 | GB19960005066 | 11.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9605066 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719819 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862518 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862518 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0862518 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41N3/03 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B41N3/038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/37] | Extension states | AL | 10.06.1998 | LT | 10.06.1998 | LV | 10.06.1998 | RO | 10.06.1998 | SI | 10.06.1998 | Title | German: | HYDROPHILIERTER TRÄGER FÜR FLACHDRUCKPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/37] | English: | HYDROPHILIZED SUPPORT FOR PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES AND ITS PREPARATION | [1998/37] | French: | SUPPORT HYDROPHYLISE POUR PLAQUES D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE ET SA PREPARATION | [1998/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2002
23.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Novelis Deutschland GmbH Hannoversche Strasse 1 37075 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2002
23.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Novelis Deutschland GmbH Hannoversche Strasse 1 37075 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.02.2002
23.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Deutschland GmbH Hannoversche Str. 1 D-37075 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 29.04.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.11.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2004 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.03.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2001 | BE | 16.05.2001 | CH | 16.05.2001 | FI | 16.05.2001 | LI | 16.05.2001 | NL | 16.05.2001 | DK | 16.08.2001 | PT | 16.08.2001 | SE | 16.08.2001 | GR | 17.08.2001 | IE | 21.11.2001 | LU | 21.11.2001 | MC | 21.11.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
GR | 17.08.2001 | ||
IE | 21.11.2001 | ||
LU | 21.11.2001 | ||
MC | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/42] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
IE | 21.11.2001 | ||
LU | 21.11.2001 | ||
MC | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
LU | 21.11.2001 | ||
MC | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
MC | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
MC | 21.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
MC | 21.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
CH | 16.05.2001 | ||
FI | 16.05.2001 | ||
LI | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 16.05.2001 | |
BE | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 16.05.2001 | |
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 16.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE112615 (THEODOR KÖHLER) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS63268642 ; | [X]JPS63268543 ; | [A]US3181461 (FROMSON HOWARD A) [A] 1* example - *; | [X]US3470013 (WAGNER RICHARD L) [X] 1-11 * example - *; | [X]GB2166255 (NIPPON FOIL MFG) [X] 1 * example - *; | [A]EP0653685 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1 * example 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890215), vol. 013, no. 067, Database accession no. (M - 798), & JP63268642 A 19881107 (SHOWA ALUM CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890215), vol. 013, no. 067, Database accession no. (M - 798), & JP63268543 A 19881107 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | Examination | DE3717757 | GB2277383 | WO02072290 |