EP0812494 - VARIABLE LENGTH DECODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKMUTSKY, Michael Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 96939254.7 | 06.12.1996 | [1997/51] | WO1996IB01373 | Priority number, date | US19950580406 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: US 580406 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724809 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812494 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40, H04N7/26 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H03M7/40 (KR);
H03M7/425 (EP,US);
H04N19/00 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/51] | Title | German: | DEKODER FÜR VARIABLE LÄNGENKODIERTE DATEN | [1997/51] | English: | VARIABLE LENGTH DECODER | [1997/51] | French: | DECODEUR EN LONGUEUR VARIABLE | [1997/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 18.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/47] | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5173695 (SUN MING-TING [US], et al); | [A]US5432512 (PARK YONG-GYU [KR]); | [A]US5343195 (COOPER JEFFREY A [US]); | [A]US5404138 (KIM SEONG DAE [KR], et al) |