EP0866658 - DAIRY PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
DK
FI
FR
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For:DE
DK
FI
FR
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1998/40] | For:DE
DK
FI
FR
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHLGREN, Lena Vindögatan 64 S-257 33 Ry de bàck / SE | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 96939905.4 | 20.11.1996 | [1998/40] | WO1996EP05171 | Priority number, date | EP19950203490 | 14.12.1995 Original published format: EP 95203490 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721353 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0866658 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0866658 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/076, A23C13/16 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
A23C19/0765 (EP,US);
A23C13/16 (EP,US);
A23C13/165 (EP,US);
A23C19/076 (EP,US);
A23C2260/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [1998/40] | Title | German: | MILCHPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/40] | English: | DAIRY PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAME | [1998/40] | French: | PRODUIT LAITIER ET PROCEDE POUR LE PREPARER | [1998/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2146955 (KRAFTCO CO) [X] 10-13 * example .; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US3929892 (HYNES JOHN T, et al) [X] 10-13 * column 4, line 21 - line 41; example I *; | SU789092 [ ] (MO PROIZV OB MOLOKO [SU]); | [A]GB2056839 (KRAFT INC) [A] 1-4,8,9 * page 4 - page 5; figure 1; example .; claims 1-13 *; | [X] - W. WALENTA ET AL., "Einfluss von Molkenproteinzusätzen auf die Strukturausbildung von Frischkäsezubereitungen", DEUTSCHE MOLKEREI ZEITUNG DMZ, MUNCHEN DE, (1988), vol. 109, no. 18, pages 538 - 543, XP002004732 [X] 10,12,13 * page 541, column 2 - page 542, column 2; figure 11 * | [X] - S. SEAS, "Development of cheese-flvored dairy spreads with controlled fat content", FOOD PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, (1975), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 68 - 74, XP002004733 [X] 10,11,13 * table II * | [X] - FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, XP002004736 [X] 10-12 * abstract * | [A] - M. KALAB ET AL., "Milk gel structure. Electron microscopy of whey protein-based cream cheese spread", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, MUNCHEN DE, (1985), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 193 - 196, XP002004734 [A] 1 * page 193, column 2 - page 194, column 1 * | [A] - H. MODLER ET AL., "Sensory evaluation of an all-dairy formulated cream-type cheese produced by a new method", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1985), vol. 68, no. 11, pages 2835 - 2839, XP002004735 [A] 1 * page 2836; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(85)81175-9 |