EP0859983 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BILL DELIVERY AND PAYMENT OVER A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL, INC. 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577-2509 / US | [1998/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGAN, Edward, J. 220-55 46th Avenue Bayside, NY 11361 / US | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96940311.2 | 31.10.1996 | [1998/35] | WO1996US17799 | Priority number, date | US19950550822 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: US 550822 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716798 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859983 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/60 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/14 (EP,US);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0176 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/35] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND ZAHLEN VON RECHNUNGEN ÜBER EIN NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSNETZWERK | [1998/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BILL DELIVERY AND PAYMENT OVER A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [1998/35] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REMISE DE FACTURE ET DE REGLEMENT VIA UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 27.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5220501 (LAWLOR MATTHEW P [US], et al); | [A]US5383113 (KIGHT PETER J [US], et al); | [A]US4823264 (DEMING GILBERT R [US]); | [AP]US5465206 (HILT JAMES J [US], et al); | [AP]US5557518 (ROSEN SHOLOM S [US]); | [AP]US5532920 (HARTRICK THOMAS V [US], et al) |