EP0874863 - 3-DEOXY-3-DESCLADINOSE DERIVATIVES OF ERYTHROMYCINS A AND B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD-0377/AP6D-2, One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OR, Yat, Sun 1107 Wellington Avenue Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 02 /
CHU, Daniel, T. 3767 Benton Street Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 03 /
ELLIOTT, Richard, L. 17419 Woodland Drive Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 04 /
PIREH, Daisy 12 Newcastle Lane Lincolnshire, IL 60069 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96940766.7 | 06.11.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996US17892 | Priority number, date | US19950006342P | 08.11.1995 Original published format: US 6342 P | US19960729269 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 729269 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717357 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874863 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874863 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, A61K31/70 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | 3-DEOXY-3-DESCLADINOSEDERIVATE VON ERYTHROMYCIN A UND B | [1998/45] | English: | 3-DEOXY-3-DESCLADINOSE DERIVATIVES OF ERYTHROMYCINS A AND B | [1998/45] | French: | DERIVES 3-DESOXY-3-DESCLADINOSE DES ERYTHROMYCINES A ET B | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 27.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0487411 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [DX] 1,2,6,8,9,11-13 * see example 1, 'stade A'.;; example 46 *; | [X]EP0619319 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11-13 * claim 1 *; | [A] - R.A. LEMAHIEU ET AL., "Glycoside Cleavage Reactions on Erythromycin A", J. MED. CHEM., (1974), vol. 17, pages 953 - 6, XP002024503 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |