EP0862843 - CROSSBAR/HUB ARRANGEMENT FOR MULTIMEDIA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states Samsung Information Systems America 3655 North First Street San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMPLEMAN, Richard 117 Doe Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96940860.8 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/37] | WO1996US18800 | Priority number, date | US19950561534 | 22.11.1995 Original published format: US 561534 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9719566 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0862843 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862843 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
H04L12/2838 (EP,US);
H04Q11/04 (KR);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/44 (EP,US);
H04L12/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/37] | Title | German: | KREUZVERMITTLUNGSSCHALTER UND VERMITTLUNGSKNOTEN FÜR EIN MULTIMEDIA-KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [1998/37] | English: | CROSSBAR/HUB ARRANGEMENT FOR MULTIMEDIA NETWORK | [1998/37] | French: | ACCESSOIRE BARRETTE CROISEE/PLOT DESTINE A UN RESEAU MULTIMEDIA | [1998/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4081792 (SCHUSSLER HANS, et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 3 - line 13 ** column 4, line 61 - line 66 *; | [XY]US5440554 (STANNARD RICHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 55 - line 68 * * column 2, line 28 - line 36 * * column 2, line 53 - line 60 * * column 3, line 44 - line 56 * * column 5, line 10 - line 26 * [Y] 5 |