EP0862504 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING CONTAINERS PAST A DEVICE FOR INSPECTING THE CONTAINER BASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEUFT SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH Brohltalstrasse 31-33 56659 Burgbrohl / DE | [2000/35] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states HEUFT SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH Brohltalstrasse 29-33 D-56659 Burgbrohl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUFT, Bernhard Lindenstrasse 7 D-56659 Burgbrohl / DE | 02 /
GOLLER, Hans-Ulrich Rheinallee 68 D-53173 Bonn-Bad Godesberg / DE | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96941018.2 | 25.11.1996 | [1998/37] | WO1996EP05192 | Priority number, date | DE1995218639U | 24.11.1995 Original published format: DE 29518639 U | [1998/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719766 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862504 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862504 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/34 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B07C5/122 (EP,US);
B07C5/34 (KR);
B07C5/3404 (EP,US);
G01N21/9009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN VON BEHÄLTERN VORBEI AN EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUM INSPIZIEREN DES BODENS DER BEHÄLTER | [1998/37] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING CONTAINERS PAST A DEVICE FOR INSPECTING THE CONTAINER BASES | [1998/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE PASSER DES CONTENANTS DEVANT UN DISPOSITIF CHARGE DE CONTROLER LEUR FOND | [1998/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.08.2000 | [2001/29] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2717955 (KRONSEDER HERMANN); | [DY]EP0124164 (THOMASSEN & DRIJVER [NL]) [DY] 7 * abstract *; | [XY]US4915237 (CHANG ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 3; figures 1,6,7 * [Y] 7 |