EP0871796 - COATED MILLING INSERT AND METHOD OF MAKING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2003/04] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖSTLUND, Ake Sedelvägen 12 S-129 32 Hägersten / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Jeanette Hästhagsvägen 11 S-131 33 Nacka / SE | 03 /
LJUNGBERG, Björn Kulstötarvägen 96 S-122 44 Enskede / SE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patents & Licences Fack 811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patents & Licences Fack 811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Application number, filing date | 96941281.6 | 29.11.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996SE01577 | Priority number, date | SE19950004304 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: SE 9504304 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720081 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871796 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871796 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/30, C23C16/40, C23C30/00, B23B27/14 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
C23C16/30 (EP,KR,US);
C22C29/08 (EP,US);
C23C16/40 (KR);
Y10T428/12792 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER MAHLEINSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/43] | English: | COATED MILLING INSERT AND METHOD OF MAKING IT | [1998/43] | French: | PIECE RAPPORTEE DE TYPE FRAISE POURVUE D'UN REVETEMENT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP06108254 ; | [Y]JP06008008 ; | [Y]US4643620 (FUJII HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0408535 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]); | [Y]EP0594875 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]); | [XP]EP0685572 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]); | [YP]EP0693574 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [XP]EP0709484 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 392, C-1228; & JP,A,06 108 254 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP), 19 April 1994., & JP06108254 A 19940419 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 203, M-1590; & JP,A,06 008 008 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP), 18 January 1994., & JP06008008 A 19940118 |