EP0871423 - NEGATIVE PRESSURE CHEST BRACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION 207 Old Main Building University Park, PA 16802 / US | [2005/36] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION 207 Old Main Building University Park, PA 16802 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Charles 660 Appenzell Drive Hummelstown, PA 17036 / US | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942048.8 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996US18794 | Priority number, date | US19950560267 | 21.11.1995 Original published format: US 560267 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718789 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871423 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871423 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61H31/00, A61H31/02 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A61H31/02 (EP,US);
A61H2031/002 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0103 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0192 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1238 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | A61H31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | UNTERDRUCKKORSETT | [1998/43] | English: | NEGATIVE PRESSURE CHEST BRACE | [1998/43] | French: | CORSET A PRESSION NEGATIVE | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 18.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.2005 | BE | 07.09.2005 | CH | 07.09.2005 | DK | 07.09.2005 | ES | 07.09.2005 | FI | 07.09.2005 | LI | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | SE | 07.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
BE | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
BE | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 07.09.2005 | |
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SE | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0584505 (FUCHS CARL GUENTHER DR MED [DE]) [X] 11 * the whole document *[A] 1,4; | [XA]WO9420060 (DATASCOPE INVESTMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,7-10 * page 15, line 6 - line 15 * * page 22, line 5 - line 29 * * page 29, line 10 - page 30, line 12 * [A] 4,6,11; | [PXA]WO9634590 (DRANEZ ANSTALT [LI], et al) [PX] 1,2,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 3-6 | International search | [Y]US2833275 (JAMES TUNNICLIFFE EDWARD ALBER); | [X]EP0509773 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [Y]US5466724 (VOLKE ROBERT W [US], et al) |