EP0874717 - BACKING PLATES FOR ABRASIVE DISKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester, Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN OSENBRUGGEN, Anthony, Alfred 99 Sabulite Road Kelston Auckland 1007 / NZ | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 96942067.8 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996US18927 | Priority number, date | NZ19950280634 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: NZ 28063495 | NZ19950280710 | 19.12.1995 Original published format: NZ 28071095 | NZ19960280781 | 04.01.1996 Original published format: NZ 28078196 | NZ19960280876 | 23.01.1996 Original published format: NZ 28087696 | NZ19960280964 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: NZ 28096496 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721520 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874717 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874717 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B24D9/08 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B24D7/10 (EP,US);
B24D9/08 (EP,KR,US);
B24D7/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | TRÄGERPLATTEN FÜR SCHLEIFSCHEIBEN | [1998/45] | English: | BACKING PLATES FOR ABRASIVE DISKS | [1998/45] | French: | PLAQUES DE SUPPORT POUR DISQUES ABRASIFS | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.11.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.11.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 21.01.2003 | Appeal received No. T1016/00 | 20.03.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.08.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Appeal received No. T1016/00 | 19.09.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.04.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9529788 (AVOS SPEED CUP LIMITED [NZ], et al) [X] 1* the whole document * |