EP0868702 - DECONVOLUTION METHOD FOR THE ANALYSIS OF DATA RESULTING FROM ANALYTICAL SEPARATION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PE Corporation (NY) 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states PE Corporation (NY) 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states THE PERKIN ELMER CORPORATION 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, California 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLISON, Daniel, B. 880 Roble Avenue 1 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
BOWLBY, James, O., Jr. 1974 Josephine Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96942130.4 | 02.12.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996US19242 | Priority number, date | US19950579204 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: US 579204 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722942 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868702 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868702 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/15, G06F19/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
G06F18/00 (EP,US);
G01N30/8617 (EP,US);
G06F2218/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/41] | G06F19/00, G06F17/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | AUS ANALYTISCHEN TRENNUNGSPROZESSEN RESULTIERENDES DEKONVOLUTIONSVERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON DATEN | [1998/41] | English: | DECONVOLUTION METHOD FOR THE ANALYSIS OF DATA RESULTING FROM ANALYTICAL SEPARATION PROCESSES | [1998/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECONVOLUTION SERVANT A EFFECTUER L'ANALYSE DE DONNEES OBTENUES AU MOYEN DE PROCESSUS DE SEPARATION ANALYTIQUE | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 18.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.2002 | BE | 27.03.2002 | FI | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | IE | 02.12.2002 | LU | 02.12.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
IE | 02.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 02.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4532548 (ZWIRN ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 25 - line 43 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 42 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 24 *; | [X]WO9414131 (US COMMERCE [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 18 * * page 8, line 3 - page 9, line 17 * * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 4 * * page 14, line 14 - page 18, line 12 *; | [X] - ZHAO J ET AL, "INVESTIGATION OF BLOCK FILTERING AND DECONVOLUTION FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF LATERAL RESOLUTION AND FLAW SIZING ACCURACY IN ULTRASONIC TESTING", ULTRASONICS, (19950501), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 187 - 194, XP000536424 [X] 1-9 * page 188, column L, line 36 - page 189, column R, line 40 * * page 190, column R, line 3 - line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-624X(94)00024-J | [A] - BAHRAM JAVIDI ET AL, "IMAGE DECONVOLUTION BY NONLINEAR SIGNAL PROCESSING", APPLIED OPTICS, (19890801), vol. 28, no. 15, pages 3106 - 3111, XP000033762 [A] 1-9 * page 3107, column L, line 6 - page 3109, column L, line 32 * | [A] - KONDO H ET AL, "ADAPTIVE IMAGE RESTORATION USING CONSTRAINED DECONVOLUTION", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, (19891101), vol. E72, no. 11, pages 1243 - 1250, XP000086632 [A] 1-9 * page 1244, column L, line 40 - page 1245, column R, line 13 * | [A] - MEHMET BILGEN ET AL, "RESTORATION OF NOISY IMAGES BLURRED BY A RANDOM POINT SPREAD FUNCTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, NEW ORLEANS, MAY 1 - 3, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900501), vol. 1 OF 4, pages 759 - 762, XP000166934 [A] 1-9 * page 759, column R, line 13 - page 760, column R, line 43 * | [X] - BILGEN M ET AL, "RESTORATION OF NOISY IMAGES BLURRED BY A RANDOM MEDIUM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER BASED MEDICAL SYSTE, DURHAM, JUNE 14 - 17, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920614), no. SYMP. 5, pages 250 - 256, XP000308281 [X] 1-9 * page 251, line 1 - page 253, line 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CBMS.1992.244941 | [A] - S.DORE ET AL, "Experimental determination of CT point spread function", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, IEEE PRESS NEW YORK USA, SEATTLE, WA, USA, (19891109), vol. 2, pages 620 - 621, XP002026986 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |