EP0863948 - BITUMEN COMPOSITIONS AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MC | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHION, Jacques Shell Recherche S.A. Centre de Recherche Route de Caen F-76530 Grand-Couronne / FR | 02 /
MORIZUR, Marie-Françoise Shell Recherche S.A. Centre de Recherche Route de Caen F-76530 Grand-Couronne / FR | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Spierenburg, Jan Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Spierenburg, Jan Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 96942310.2 | 27.11.1996 | [1998/38] | WO1996EP05366 | Priority number, date | EP19950308549 | 28.11.1995 Original published format: EP 95308549 | EP19950402790 | 11.12.1995 Original published format: EP 95402790 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9719981 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863948 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863948 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08J9/30 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
C08J9/30 (EP,KR);
C08L95/00 (EP,KR);
C10C3/04 (EP);
C08J2395/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L53/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/38] | Extension states | SI | 05.05.1998 | Title | German: | BITUMENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/38] | English: | BITUMEN COMPOSITIONS AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1998/38] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE BITUME ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1998/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 21.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 27.11.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/17] | MC | 30.11.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3853798 (OELSNER M, et al) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]WO9416019 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * example -; claim - * |