EP0873448 - SECURITY PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited 6 Agar Street London WC2N 4DE / GB | ||
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states PORTALS LIMITED 6 Agar Street London, WC2N 4DE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWLAND, Paul 71 Springfield Close Andover Hampshire SP10 2QR / GB | 02 /
FOULKES, Jonathan, Paul 9 Weyhill Gardens Weyhill Andover Hampshire P11 0QS / GB | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942477.9 | 18.12.1996 | [1998/44] | WO1996GB03120 | Priority number, date | GB19960000686 | 12.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9600686 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9725476 | Date: | 17.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0873448 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0873448 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H13/16, D21H15/10, D21H21/40 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
D21H21/40 (EP,KR,US);
D21H13/16 (EP,KR,US);
D21H15/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] | Extension states | RO | 10.07.1998 | SI | 10.07.1998 | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSPAPIER | [1999/17] | English: | SECURITY PAPER | [1998/44] | French: | PAPIER DE SECURITE | [1999/17] |
Former [1998/44] | UNVERFÄLSCHBARES PAPIER | ||
Former [1998/44] | PAPIER INFALSIFIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1999 | BE | 03.11.1999 | GR | 03.11.1999 | LU | 18.12.1999 | IE | 03.01.2000 | MC | 03.01.2000 | PT | 03.02.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2002/42] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.01.2000 | ||
MC | 03.01.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.01.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.01.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63264998 ; | [A]US3114670 (HIROSHI IWASAKI) [A] 1 * example 2 *; | [A]DE1411338 (HUBER DR OTTO) [A] 1-4,6 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0319157 (PORTALS LTD [GB]) [A] 1* page 8, line 18 - line 21; example 9 *; | [DX]NL9301835 (VHP UGCHELEN BV) [DX] 1,2,6,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 49, Database accession no. 88-351512, XP002029231 & JPS63264998 A 19881101 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |