EP0802341 - CONSTANT VELOCITY UNIVERSAL COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2010/17] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states NTN CORPORATION 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0003 / JP | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states NTN CORPORATION 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONE, Keisuke 314-2, Sanshincho,Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430 / JP | 02 /
HOZUMI, Kazuhiko 1044-3, Kawai,Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka 437 / JP | 03 /
KANEKO, Yoshihisa 1582-1, Mutsumi,Morimachi,Shuchi-gun Shizuoka 437-02 / JP | 04 /
SUGIYAMA, Tatsuro 3070-1, Mitsuke,Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438 / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Klitzsch, Gottfried, et al Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner, Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk, 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [1997/43] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942575.0 | 19.12.1996 | [1997/43] | WO1996JP03702 | Priority number, date | JP19950339345 | 26.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33934595 | JP19950343519 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34351995 | JP19960107316 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: JP 10731696 | JP19960133998 | 28.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13399896 | JP19960133999 | 28.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13399996 | JP19960157594 | 28.05.1996 Original published format: JP 15759496 | JP19960259484 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25948496 | [1997/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724538 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802341 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802341 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0802341 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/20 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
F16D3/2245 (EP,US);
B60B35/18 (EP,US);
F16D3/223 (EP,US);
B60G2200/144 (EP,US);
B60G2200/422 (EP,US);
B60G2204/416 (EP,US);
F16D2003/22303 (EP,US);
F16D2300/10 (EP,US);
F16D2300/12 (EP,US);
Y10S464/906 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/43] | Title | German: | HOMOKINETISCHES KREUZGELENK | [1997/43] | English: | CONSTANT VELOCITY UNIVERSAL COUPLING | [1997/43] | French: | COUPLAGE UNIVERSEL A VITESSE CONSTANTE | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1997 | Translation filed | 07.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP02003004.5 / EP1209372 | EP02003007.8 / EP1209373 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.06.2003
13.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE GKN Automotive GmbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
03.06.2003
13.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Beck, Michael Rudolf Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.06.2003
13.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE GKN Automotive GmbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
03.06.2003
13.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Beck, Michael Rudolf Beck & Rössig, European Patent Attorneys, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 9 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.06.2003
13.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE GKN Automotive GmbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Ernst Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 14 55 53704 Siegburg / DE | ||
02
03.06.2003
13.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Beck, Michael Rudolf Beck & Rössig, European Patent Attorneys, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 9 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.06.2003
GKN Automotive AG Hauptstr. 150 53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Ernst Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 14 55 53704 Siegburg / DE | ||
02
03.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Beck, Michael Rudolf Beck & Rössig, European Patent Attorneys, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 9 81541 München / DE | 10.07.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 16.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.05.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.01.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.06.2006 | Appeal received No. T1020/06 | 29.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.05.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 15.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Petition(s) for review: | 26.08.2009 | Petition for review received | Number: R0014/09 | for appeal No. T1020/06-3201 | Petitioner: OP01 | 22.12.2009 | Decision: Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only. | 22.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3298201 (JEAN CADIOU) [A] 14-16,18 * column 2, line 16 - line 40 * * claims 1,2 ** figures 2,3 *; | [Y]DD97926 (UNI-CARDAN AG) [Y] 11 * page 8, column R, line 27 - line 45 * * figures 28,29 *; | [A]FR2512141 (GIRGUIS SOBHY [DE]) [A] 5 * page 8, line 19 - line 32 * * page 9, line 32 - line 35 * * figures 1,2A *; | [XY]US5221233 (JACOB WERNER [DE]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * figure 4 * * claim 7 * [Y] 11 | International search | [X]JPS6158684B ; | [X]JPH0223731B ; | [X]JPH03292419 (KUBOTA KK); | [X]JPH04307117 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG); | [X]JPH0625708Y ; | [XE]JPH08210374 (LOEHR & BROMKAMP GMBH) | Examination | US4472159 | US4493676 | JPH03292419 | JPH04307117 | Opposition | US1916442 | US3187520 | GB1336129 | DE3000119 | US4726796 | US4861316 | DE3800031 | US5129752 | DE4208786 | DE4211758 | DE4234488 | EP0661475 | DE4410298 | DE4419341 | DE19519772 | DE4440285 | - SCHMELZ F. ET AL, Gelenke und Gelenkwellen, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1988), page 214 | - MACIELINSKI J.W., "Paper 29. Propeller Shafts and Universal Joints - Characteristics and Methods of Selection", PROC INSTN MECH ENGRS, (1969), vol. 184, no. 31, pages 516 - 543 | - DANA CORPORATION, "Catalogue - Con-Vel Constant Velocity Joints" |