EP0875008 - Dual orientation retroreflective sheeting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/45] | DUAL ORIENTATION RETROREFLECTIVE SHEETING | ||
[2000/34] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESTEGARD, Susan, K. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BENSON, Gerald, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
FREY, Cheryl, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
KELLIHER, John, C. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
LASCH, James, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
SMITH, Kenneth, L. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
SZCZECH, Theodore, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/45] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96942885.3 | 05.12.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996US19318 | Priority number, date | US19960587719 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: US 587719 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726567 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875008 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875008 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0875008 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/124 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
G02B5/124 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/45] | Title | German: | Retroreflektive Folie mit zweifacher Orientierung | [2000/34] | English: | Dual orientation retroreflective sheeting | [2000/34] | French: | Feuille rétroréfléchissante à double orientation | [2000/34] |
Former [1998/45] | RETROREFLEKTIVE FOLIE MIT DOPPELTER ORIENTIERUNG | ||
Former [1998/45] | DUAL ORIENTATION RETROREFLECTIVE SHEETING | ||
Former [1998/45] | FEUILLE RETROREFLECHISSANTE A DOUBLE ORIENTATION | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 10.04.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.07.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
27.12.2003
WITHDRAWN REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | 02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
WITHDRAWN Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | 03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | 04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE AVERY DENNISON CORPORATION 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
27.12.2003
WITHDRAWN REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
WITHDRAWN Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich (IE, DE) Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
27.12.2003
WITHDRAWN REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
WITHDRAWN Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich (IE, DE) Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
27.12.2003
WITHDRAWN REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
27.12.2003
WITHDRAWN REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten (DE) Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
21.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten (DE) Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
REFLEXITE CORPORATION 120 DARLING DRIVE AVON CT 06001-4217 / US Opponent's representative Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
02
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Nippon Carbide Industries Co. Inc. NCI Building, 11-19, 2-chome Kohnan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP Opponent's representative Furlong, Christopher Heinrich Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE LG CHEM. LTD. LG TWIN TOWER YOIDO-DONG 20, YOUNGDUNGPO-KU 150-721 SEOUL / KR Opponent's representative Brandl, Ferdinand Anton, Dipl.-Phys. Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04
30.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Avery International Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, California 91103 / US Opponent's representative Rocke, Carsten (DE) Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | 16.06.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.02.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.05.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 07.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0472/07 | 14.05.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 02.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.07.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/31] | AT | 31.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4243618 (VAN ARNAM DONALD E) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 3 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 31 * * figures 3,4 *; | [DA]EP0137736 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1,8-17 * page 7, line 11 - page 13, line 15 * * figures 3-6; example 1 *; | [A]WO9511471 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-5,8,9,14,15,17,27 * page 9, line 14 - line 29 * * page 15, line 19 - page 17, line 10 * * page 19, line 16 - line 29 * * page 20, line 22 - page 25, line 19 * * figures 17,18,25,26 * * figures 39-48 *; | [A]WO9511466 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,14-40 * page 5, line 29 - page 14, line 6 ** figures 1,2; examples 1-3 * |