EP0868363 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A LAMINATED PACKAGING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/41] | A LAMINATED PACKAGING MATERIAL, A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME, AND PACKAGING CONTAINERS PRODUCED FROM THE LAMINATED PACKAGING MATERIAL | ||
[2003/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430 1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLIN, Mikael Fjelievägen 13B, 4 van. S-227 36 Lund / SE | 02 /
LETH, Ib Annes Hökares väg 7 S-273 64 Kävlinge / SE | 03 /
BENTMAR, Mats Hästhovsgatan 8 S-233 37 Svedala / SE | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Sundell, Håkan Oskar Anders AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Sundell, Hakan AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 96943459.6 | 18.12.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996SE01707 | Priority number, date | DK19950001445 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: DK 144595 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722536 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868363 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868363 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/40, B65D5/56, B32B27/10 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/308 (US);
B32B2307/7244 (US);
B32B2553/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN VERPACKUNGSMATERIALS | [2003/26] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A LAMINATED PACKAGING MATERIAL | [2003/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE MULTICOUCHE | [2003/26] |
Former [1998/41] | MEHRSCHICHTIGES VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE AUS DIESEM MEHRSCHICHTIGEN VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL HERGESTELLTE VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTER | ||
Former [1998/41] | A LAMINATED PACKAGING MATERIAL, A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME, AND PACKAGING CONTAINERS PRODUCED FROM THE LAMINATED PACKAGING MATERIAL | ||
Former [1998/41] | MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE MULTICOUCHE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET EMBALLAGES FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CE MATERIAU | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 16.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]JP08310546 ; | [XP]WO9620832 ; | [X]US5389724 ; | [X]JP06055702 ; | [X]WO9312924 ; | [X]DE3233693 ; | [A]EP0423511 ; | [A]EP0381922 ; | [A]US4753845 ; | [A]US4418119 | [XP] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 97-061366, Week 9706; & JP,A,08 310 546 (KUREHA CHEM IND CO LTD), 26 November 1996., & JP08310546 A 19961126 | [X] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 94-106393, Week 9413; & JP,A,06 055 702 (GOYO SHIKO KK), 1 March 1994., & JP06055702 A 19940301 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 018, No. 289; & JP,A,06 055 702, (GOYO PAPER WORKING CO LTD) 01-03-94., & JP06055702 A 00000000 |