EP0871400 - OBTAINING DATA ON HEARING CAPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plinkert, Peter K. Lustnauer Strasse 64/1 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | For all designated states Schnitzler, Hans-Ulrich Hainbuchenweg 24 72076 Tübingen / DE | For all designated states Zenner, Hans-Peter Burgholzweg 149 72070 Tübingen / DE | For all designated states Heitmann, Jürgen Wilhelm-Schussen-Weg 5 72074 Tübingen / DE | For all designated states Waldmann, Bernd Gartenstrasse 117 72074 Tübingen / DE | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEITMANN, Jürgen Wilhelm-Schussen-Weg 5 D-72074 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
WALDMANN, Bernd Gartenstrasse 117 D-72074 Tübingen / DE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96943915.7 | 11.12.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996EP05527 | Priority number, date | DE1995149165 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19549165 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724065 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871400 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871400 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/12 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
A61B5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1999/01] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB | Title | German: | ERMITTLUNG VON DATEN ÜBER DAS HÖRVERMÖGEN | [1998/43] | English: | OBTAINING DATA ON HEARING CAPACITY | [1998/43] | French: | DETERMINATION DE DONNEES SUR LA CAPACITE AUDITIVE | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2000 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.07.1998 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.06.2000 | [2003/46] | Cited in | International search | [X] - KETTEMBEIL, MANLEY, SIEGL, "Distortion-product otoacoustic emissions and their anaesthesia sensitivity in the European Starling and the chicken", HEARING RESEARCH, DIE NIEDERLANDE, (199506), vol. 86, no. 1-2, pages 47 - 62, XP000672455 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5955(95)00053-7 |