EP0810885 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING VOLATILE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine, Wisconsin 53403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIES, Alun 6 Kingsmead Frimley Green Camberley Surrey GU16 6LU / GB | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96944378.7 | 13.12.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996US19952 | Priority number, date | GB19950025954 | 19.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9525954 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722370 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810885 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810885 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/12 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
A61L9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE VON FLÜCHTIGEN STOFFEN | [1997/50] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING VOLATILE MATERIAL | [1997/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DIFFUSER UNE SUBSTANCE VOLATILE | [1997/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.11.2001 | BE | 28.11.2001 | CH | 28.11.2001 | FI | 28.11.2001 | GR | 28.11.2001 | LI | 28.11.2001 | NL | 28.11.2001 | IE | 13.12.2001 | LU | 13.12.2001 | DK | 28.02.2002 | SE | 28.02.2002 | [2004/42] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
FI | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
LU | 13.12.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
FI | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
FI | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 28.11.2001 | |
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
FI | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 28.11.2001 | |
FI | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 28.11.2001 | |
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 28.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0081791 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *; | [DY]WO8402654 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [DY] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2161383 (MONTEDISON SPA) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0495631 (BLOCK DRUG CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure - *; | [A]DE4406581 (BECKER & CO NATURINWERK [DE]) |