EP0870100 - FLAMELESS COMBUSTOR AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/42] | FLAMELESS COMBUSTOR | ||
[1999/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARANIKAS, John, Michael 4655 Wild Indigo, No. 302 Houston, TX 77027 / US | 02 /
MIKUS, Thomas 906 Coachlight Drive Houston, TX 77077 / US | 03 /
VINEGAR, Harold, J. 5219 Yarwell Houston, TX 77096 / US | 04 /
WELLINGTON, Scott, Lee 2111 Shadybriar Drive Houston, TX 77077 / US | [1998/42] | Application number, filing date | 96944607.9 | 17.12.1996 | [1998/42] | WO1996EP05753 | Priority number, date | US19950009345P | 27.12.1995 Original published format: US 9345 P | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724509 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870100 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870100 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B36/02 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
F23C13/02 (EP,US);
E21B36/02 (EP,KR,US);
E21B43/243 (EP,US);
F23C2900/99001 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/42] | Title | German: | FLAMENLOSE VERBRENNVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [1999/27] | English: | FLAMELESS COMBUSTOR AND METHOD | [1999/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMBUSTION SANS FLAMME ET PROCEDE | [1999/27] |
Former [1998/42] | FLAMENBLASE VERBRENNVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1998/42] | FLAMELESS COMBUSTOR | ||
Former [1998/42] | APPAREIL DE COMBUSTION SANS FLAMME | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4445570 (RETALLICK WILLIAM B [US]); | [X]US5404952 (VINEGAR HAROLD J [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 5, line 24 - column 7, line 2 * * column 8, line 29 - line 45; figure - * |