EP0958677 - PROTOCOL CONVERTER APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterling Commerce, Inc. Suite 1200, 300 Crescent Court Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Sterling Commerce Inc. Suite 1200, 300 Crescent Court Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADLAND, John, K. 335 Cedar Street Omaha, NE 68108-1219 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96944776.2 | 09.12.1996 | [1999/47] | WO1996US19596 | Priority number, date | US19960582536 | 03.01.1996 Original published format: US 582536 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9725665 | Date: | 17.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958677 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/00, H04L29/00, G06F13/00, H04L29/06 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
G06F13/387 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | H04L12/00, H04L29/00, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | PROTOKOLLKONVERTERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [1999/47] | English: | PROTOCOL CONVERTER APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1999/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONVERSION DE PROTOCOLE | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 29.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/22] | 27.10.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.11.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0573248 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 3,4,10,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 4 *; | [XY] - ZHANG L, "HOW TO BUILD A GATEWAY - C-GATEWAY: AN EXAMPLE", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND APPLICATIONS. BEIJING, JUNE 23 - 27, 1987, WASHINGTON, IEEE COMPUTER SOC. PRESS, US, (198706), vol. CONF. 2, pages 461 - 468, XP000812885 [X] 1,2,5-9,12-22 * paragraph [02.2] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [03.2] * * paragraph [03.4] * * paragraph [0004] * [Y] 3,4,10,11 | [XY] - ESTRIN D, "INTER-ORGANIZATION NETWORKS: IMPLICATIONS OF ACCESS CONTROL REQUIREMENTS FOR INTERCONNECTION PROTOCOLS", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (19860805), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0146-4833, pages 254 - 264, XP000812883 [X] 1,2,8,9,14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [03.1] * * paragraph [04.1] - paragraph [0005] * [Y] 3,4,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1013812.18201 | [X] - RAJAGOPAL, MURALI; MILLER, RAYMOND, "Synthesizing a Protocol Converter from Executable Protocol Traces", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS NO4,, New York, (199104), vol. 4, pages 487 - 498, XP000237276 [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [001A] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.88468 | International search | [Y]US5182748 (SAKATA SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5208811 (KASHIO JIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5276732 (STENT ROBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US5398336 (TANTRY SUBHASH B [US], et al); | [Y]US5432901 (HARPER THOMAS A [US], et al); | [YP]US5497373 (HULEN JOHN S [US], et al); | [YP]US5530434 (KANDA TAKESHI [JP]) |