EP0883339 - CELL CULTURE APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avecor Cardiovascular Inc. 13010 County Road 6 Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CODNER, Meryl 1441 Albany Avenue St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96944837.2 | 16.12.1996 | [1998/51] | WO1996US20050 | Priority number, date | US19950574452 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: US 574452 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721347 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883339 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12M1/00 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
C12M23/24 (EP,US);
C12M23/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | A01N1/02, C12N5/00, C12N5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/51] | Title | German: | ZELLKULTURVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [1998/51] | English: | CELL CULTURE APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1998/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/18] | 29.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/18] | Request for further processing for: | 02.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1530705 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED) [X] 1-9 * figure -; example 7; claim - * | International search | [X]US4829002 (PATTILLO MARTHA C [US], et al); | [Y]US4093515 (KOLOBOW THEODOR); | [Y]US5149649 (MIYAMORI TAKAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5225346 (MATSUMIYA TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) |