EP0876335 - PRODUCTION OF ISOCYANATE USING CHLORINE RECYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2004 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of South Carolina Research Foundation 901 Sumter Street, Suite 501, Byrnes Building Columbia South Carolina 29208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states University of South Carolina Research Foundation 901 Sumter Street, Suite 501, Byrnes Building Columbia, South Carolina 29208 / US | ||
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREIRE, Francisco, Jose 205 Glenwood Avenue Wilmington, DE 19803-3938 / US | 02 /
KAISER, Bruce, Arthur 4010 Valley Green Road Wilmington, DE 19807-2200 / US | 03 /
FELIX, Vinci, Martinez 437 E. Street Road Kennett Square, PA 19348-1831 / US | 04 /
MAH, Dennie, Turin 2609 Majestic Drive Wilmington, DE 19810-2430 / US | 05 /
TRAINHAM, James, Arthur, III 7 Whitehaven Court Newark, DE 19711-3444 / US | 06 /
LAW, Clarence, Garlan, Jr. 19 Pardee Place West Trenton, NJ 08628-2022 / US | 07 /
NEWMAN, John, Scott 114 York Avenue Kensington, CA 94708 / US | 08 /
EAMES, Douglas, John 1881 Hickory Road Chamblee, GA 30341 / US | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/11] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1998/46] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96944989.1 | 17.12.1996 | [1998/46] | WO1996US20533 | Priority number, date | US19950609340 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: US 609340 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724320 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876335 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876335 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0876335 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C263/10, C25B1/26 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
C25B1/26 (EP);
C07C263/10 (EP);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/10, C07C265/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/46] | Title | German: | DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ISOCYANATEN UNTER WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON CHLOR | [1998/46] | English: | PRODUCTION OF ISOCYANATE USING CHLORINE RECYCLE | [1998/46] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ISOCYANATE A L'AIDE DE CHLORE RECYCLE | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 30.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 16.03.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.01.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.05.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.02.2004 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9514796 (DU PONT) [Y] 1,5,11 * page 7, line 6 - line 12; figures 3,4; claims 1,9 *; | [A]JPS541281 | [Y] - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5th edition, vol A 14, WEINHEIM (DE), VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, (1989), XP002028897 [Y] 1,5,11 * page 620, column R, line 5 - line 8 * * page 616, column R, line 42 - line 46 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 07, Database accession no. 79-12716B, XP002028898 & JPS541281 A 19790108 (OVAL KIKI KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * | Opposition | US5411641 | - A.K, Twitchet, Chem. Soc. Rev. 3, 1974, pp. 209-230 | - Becker et al (Ed.) Kunststoff Handbuch, vol. 7, Polyurethane, Carl Hanser Verlag, 3rd ed., 1993, pp. 79-80 | - K. Weissermel et al, Ind. org. Chem., VCH-Verlag, 3rd ed., 1988, pp. 26-30 |