EP0888122 - HYBRID WITH INTERFERON-alpha AND AN IMMUNOGLOBULIN Fc LINKED THROUGH A NON-IMMUNOGENIC PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanox, Inc. 10301 Stella Link Houston TX 77025-54 / US | [2007/09] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states TANOX BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 10301 Stella Link Rd. Houston, TX 77025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Tse Wen National Tsing Hua University, Dormitory West Yard 46-4, Hsinchu, Taiwan 300 / CN | 02 /
YU, Liming 3199-C Evening Way La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1999/17] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
CHANG, Tse Wen Apartment 7110, 3000 Bissonnett Houston, TX 77005 / US | ||
02 /
YU, Liming 4106 Martinshire Houston, TX 77025 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96945126.9 | 13.12.1996 | [1999/01] | WO1996US20861 | Priority number, date | US19950579211 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: US 579211 | US19960719331 | 25.09.1996 Original published format: US 719331 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724137 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888122 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888122 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/21, A61K39/39, C07K14/56 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C07K14/56 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | A61K38/21, A61K39/395, A61K39/44, C07K14/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | HYBRID AUS INTERFERON-alpha UND IMMUNGLOBULIN Fc-FRAGMENT VERBUNDEN DURCH EIN NICHT IMMUNOGENES PEPTID | [2006/37] | English: | HYBRID WITH INTERFERON-alpha AND AN IMMUNOGLOBULIN Fc LINKED THROUGH A NON-IMMUNOGENIC PEPTIDE | [1999/01] | French: | PROTEINE HYBRIDE A INTERFERON-alpha ET FRAGMENT Fc D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE A LIAISON ASSUREE PAR PEPTIDE NON IMMUNOGENE | [1999/01] |
Former [1999/01] | HYBRID AUS INTERFERON-alpha UND IMMUNGLOBULIN Fc-FRAGMENT VERBUNDEN DURCH EIN MICHT IMMUNOGENES PEPTID | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 22.04.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.05.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/07] | DK | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - KUERSCHNER C ET AL, "IFN-GAMMA RECEPTOR-IG FUSION PROTEINS HALF-LIFE, IMMUNOGENICITY, AND IN VIVO ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (19921215), vol. 149, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4096 - 4100, XP002035883 [AD] * Abstract; page 525, right hand column, lines 19-35 and page 527, right hand column, lines 3-6 * | [AD] - CAPON D J ET AL, "DESIGNING CD4 IMMUNOADHESINS FOR AIDS THERAPY", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19890209), vol. 337, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 525 - 531, XP000677773 [AD] * Abstract, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/337525a0 | International search | [Y]WO9116353 (CORVAS INTERNATIONAL N V [BE]); | [Y]US5349053 (LANDOLFI NICHOLAS F [US]) | [Y] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, 1990, Vol. 10, No. 3, BARON E. et al., "From Cloning to a Commercial Realization: Human Alpha Interferon", pages 197-190. |