EP1019426 - NOVEL A1 ADENOSINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/29] | NOVEL A 1? ADENOSINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS | ||
[2003/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Incorporated 223 Grinter Hall Florida 32611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Incorporated 223 Grinter Hall Florida 32611 / US | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELARDINELLI, Luiz 4332 N.W. 9th Place Gainesville, FL 32605 / US | 02 /
OLSSON, Ray 5114 W. Cleveland Street Tampa, FL 33609-3504 / US | 03 /
BAKER, Stephen 2210 N.W. 20th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32605 / US | 04 /
SCAMMELLS, Peter, J. Unit 3/69 Fryers Road Highton, VIC 3216 / AU | 05 /
MILNER, Peter, G. 1001 Ray Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 06 /
PFISTER, Jurg, R. 1500 Oak Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/29] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96945316.6 | 26.12.1996 | [2000/29] | WO1996US20840 | Priority number, date | US19950581655 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: US 581655 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724363 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019426 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019426 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/16, A61K31/70 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
C07H19/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
C07D473/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | A1 ADENOSIN REZEPTOR AGONISTEN UND ANTAGONISTEN | [2000/29] | English: | NOVEL A1 ADENOSINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS | [2003/05] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANTAGONISTES ET AGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS DE L'ADENOSINE A1 | [2003/05] |
Former [2000/29] | NOVEL A 1? ADENOSINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS | ||
Former [2000/29] | NOUVEAUX ANTAGONISTES ET AGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS DE L'ADENOSINE A 1? | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4364922 (BERNE ROBERT M, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4980379 (BELARDINELLI LUIZ [US], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DX]WO9511904 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [DX] 1-38 * the whole document * |