EP0860011 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THE REQUIRED HIGH VOLTAGE FOR PROGRAMMING/ERASING AN EEPROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDLAK, Holger Balanstrasse 63 D-81541 München / DE | 02 /
VIEHMANN, Hans-Heinrich Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 33 D-81739 München / DE | [1998/35] | Application number, filing date | 96945974.2 | 04.11.1996 | [1998/35] | WO1996DE02099 | Priority number, date | DE1995142029 | 10.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19542029 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9717704 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860011 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860011 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C16/06 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
G11C16/30 (EP);
G11C16/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SELBSTTÄTIGEN ERMITTELN DER NÖTIGEN HOCHSPANNUNG ZUM PROGRAMMIEREN/LÖSCHEN EINES EEPROMS | [1998/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THE REQUIRED HIGH VOLTAGE FOR PROGRAMMING/ERASING AN EEPROM | [1998/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION AUTOMATIQUE DE LA HAUTE TENSION REQUISE POUR PROGRAMMER/EFFACER UNE MEMOIRE EEPROM | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07249294 ; | [A]WO9507536 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * page 9, line 1 - page 19, line 21; figures 4-9 *; | [PA]EP0708450 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 25 - column 9, line 11; figures 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 096, no. 001, & JP07249294 A 19950926 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * |