EP0873467 - BEARING SYSTEM FOR TURBOMACHINE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITSCHE, Klaus Lierberg 40 D-45478 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
MAGHON, Helmut Stockweg 61 D-45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [1998/44] | Application number, filing date | 96946245.6 | 20.12.1996 | [1998/44] | WO1996DE02491 | Priority number, date | DE1996100419 | 08.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19600419 | [1998/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9725523 | Date: | 17.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0873467 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F01D15/10, F02C3/10, F02C7/06 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
F01D15/10 (EP);
F02C3/10 (EP);
F02C7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/44] | Title | German: | LAGERUNG FUR EINEN TURBOMASCHINENSATZ | [1998/44] | English: | BEARING SYSTEM FOR TURBOMACHINE ASSEMBLY | [1998/44] | French: | SYSTEME DE PALIERS POUR ENSEMBLE DE TURBOMACHINES | [1998/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 01.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/51] | 27.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5201796 (GLINSKI ROBERT L ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,11 * Zusammenfassung; column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]GB361305 (SIEMENS-SCHUCKERT) [X] 1,2,4-7,11 * the whole document * [A] 8,10; | [XA]DE726983 (LYSHOLM & BOESTAD) [X] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * [A] 8,10; | [A]CH214978 (OERLIKON) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE394589 (AEG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0305763 (MOTOREN TURBINEN UNION); | [A]EP0462724 (GEN ELECTRIC) |