EP0786620 - Housing for receiving individual components of a cooling or heating supply installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dumser Metallbau GmbH & Co. KG Godramsteiner Hauptstrasse 167 76829 Landau / DE | For all designated states STOROPACK HANS REICHENECKER GMBH + CO. Sommestrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states Dumser Metallbau GmbH & Co. KG Godramsteiner Hauptstrasse 167 76829 Landau/Pfalz / DE | ||
For all designated states STOROPACK HANS REICHENECKER GMBH + CO. Sommestrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumser, Josef Hermann Jürgen Strasse 12 76829 Landau / DE | 02 /
Kolaska, Karl-Heinz Rosenstrasse 11 74425 Löwenstein 2 / DE | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Patentanwälte Möll und Bitterich Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97100828.9 | 21.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | DE1996201458U | 29.01.1996 Original published format: DE 29601458 U | [1997/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786620 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786620 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/16, F16L59/14 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
F24F13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Gehäuse zur Aufnahme einzelner Komponenten einer Wärme- oder Kälteversorgungsanlage | [1997/31] | English: | Housing for receiving individual components of a cooling or heating supply installation | [1997/31] | French: | Boîtier pour recevoir des composants individuels d'une installation d'alimentation de réfrigération ou de chauffage | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 16.07.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3797529 (GEBELIUS S) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2250864 (NIGOLIAN PATRICK [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0559066 (JACOBS HEINZ JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0561037 (DUMSER METALLBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4308626 (PRINZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | EP0561037 |