EP0798501 - Thermostatic valve head for heating installations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theodor Heimeier Metallwerk GmbH & Co KG Postfach 11 24 59592 Erwitte / DE | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Essfeld, Fritz kampstrasse 49 59581 Warstein / DE | 02 /
Beele, Heinz Eckhard Dahneweg 4 59609 Anröchte / DE | 03 /
Werner, Klaus Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 56 59581 Warstein / DE | 04 /
Pflüger, Andreas Stiefernbergstrasse 25 59494 Soest / DE | [1997/40] | Application number, filing date | 97100836.2 | 21.01.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | DE1996112312 | 28.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612312 | [1997/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798501 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798501 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/60, G05D23/02 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
G05D23/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/40] | Title | German: | Thermostatventil-Kopf für Heizungsanlagen | [1997/40] | English: | Thermostatic valve head for heating installations | [1997/40] | French: | Tête de valve thermostatique pour des installations de chauffage | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2001
23.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2001
23.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2001
Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwälte, Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | 25.04.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.07.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.04.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/32] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 28.05.2003 | Appeal received No. T0615/03 | 17.07.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.04.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 14.04.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2005 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.05.1997 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.1999 | 31.01.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2748412 (HEIMEIER GMBH METALL THEODOR) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2921522 (DANFOSS AS) [A] 1 * column 4, line 20 *; | [A]EP0044904 (WELLA AG [DE]); | [A]DE3040627 (OVENTROP SOHN KG F W [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3124897 (HEIMEIER GMBH METALL THEODOR [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0504582 (GIACOMINI SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE2628307 |