EP0794089 - Remote-control system for vehicle devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möller, Carsten-Uwe Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 17 73730 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Reh, Frank In den Weinbergen 8 70439 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/37] | Application number, filing date | 97101179.6 | 25.01.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | DE19961008869 | 07.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19608869 | [1997/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794089 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794089 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794089 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
H01H2003/008 (EP,US);
H01H25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/37] | Title | German: | Bediensystem, insbesondere für Komponenten in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [1997/37] | English: | Remote-control system for vehicle devices | [1997/37] | French: | Système de télécommande pour les éléments d'une voiture | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer, Enno Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | 02
05.03.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer, Enno, Dr. Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
02
05.03.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | |||
Former [2004/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer, Enno (DE) Jung HML Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 D-80799 München / DE | ||
02
05.03.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | |||
Former [2004/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer, Enno, Dr. c/o Jung HML Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | ||
02
05.03.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | |||
Former [2003/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer, Enno, Dr. Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
02
05.03.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | |||
Former [2003/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2003
07.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagen AG D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer, Enno, Dr. Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | 10.04.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.08.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/18] | 10.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5450525 (RUSSELL DONALD P [US], et al); | [XY]EP0686525 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [Y]GB2291165 (VIRTUALITY [GB]) | Examination | EP0078016 | DE4205875 |