EP0855454 - Microetching composition for copper or copper alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEC CO., Ltd. No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states MEC CO., Ltd. No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maki, Yoshiro c/o Mec Co., Ltd., No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Toshiko c/o Mec Co., Ltd., No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Yasushi c/o Mec Co., Ltd., No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Haruta, Takashi c/o Mec Co., Ltd., No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Arimura, Maki c/o Mec Co., Ltd., No. 1, Higashihatsushima-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101218.2 | 27.01.1997 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855454 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855454 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/18 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
H05K3/383 (EP,US);
C23F1/18 (EP,US);
H05K2203/121 (EP,US);
H05K2203/125 (EP,US);
H05K3/064 (EP,US);
H05K3/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/31] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zum Mikroätzen von Kupfer und Kupferlegierungen | [1998/31] | English: | Microetching composition for copper or copper alloy | [1998/31] | French: | Composition pour la micro-gravure du cuivre ou ses alliages | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0677095 ; | [A]JPS6379983 ; | [X]US4695348 (BATTEY JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 8 * * column 4, line 51 - line 55 * * column 6; claims 9,11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940620), vol. 018, no. 324, Database accession no. (E - 1564), & JP06077095 A 19940318 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880819), vol. 012, no. 306, Database accession no. (C - 522), & JP63079983 A 19880409 (SUMITOMO SPECIAL METALS CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | by applicant | US4956035 |