EP0790446 - Mechanical seal arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burgmann Dichtungswerke GmbH & Co. KG Äussere Sauerlacher Strasse 6-10 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | [2000/50] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states FEODOR BURGMANN DICHTUNGSWERKE GmbH & Co. Äussere Sauerlacher Strasse 6-10 D-82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrüfer, Andreas Fichtenweg 5 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 02 /
Ittner, Walter Schlierseeweg 2 82538 Geretsried / DE | 03 /
Svejkovsky, Reinhard Zugspitzweg 24 82538 Geretsried / DE | 04 /
Schöpf, Andreas Hermann-Roth-Strasse 1a 82065 Baierbrunn / DE | 05 /
Ziegenbein, Dieter Naturnser Strasse 4 86356 Neusäss / DE | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Schmidt, Horst, Dr. H. Schmidt & B. Müller, Postfach 44 01 20 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101446.9 | 30.01.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | DE1996202685U | 15.02.1996 Original published format: DE 29602685 U | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790446 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790446 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
F16J15/3404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Gleitringdichtungsanordnung | [1997/34] | English: | Mechanical seal arrangement | [1997/34] | French: | Garniture mécanique d'étanchéité | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.05.2000 | Appeal received No. T0638/00 | 23.06.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.03.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2001/12] | 28.03.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/13] | 18.09.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4466619 (ADAMS WILLIAM V [US]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 28; figure - *; | [A]US5217234 (HORNSBY JOHN [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 10 - line 39; figure - *; | [A]GB2268235 (AES ENG LTD [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [YD]GB2286020 (GARRETT KEITH CHARLES [GB], et al) [YD] 1 * page 2, line 4 - line 13; figure - * | by applicant | US3746349 | GB2286020 |