EP0786910 - Liquid crystal projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tashiro, Yoshiharu NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Mikio NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101456.8 | 30.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | JP19960017376 | 02.02.1996 Original published format: JP 1737696 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0786910 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0786910 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
H04N9/3105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/31] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallprojektor | [1997/31] | English: | Liquid crystal projector | [1997/31] | French: | Projecteur à cristaux liquides | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/38] | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0435288 (CANON) [X] 1,4-6 * column 7, line 58 - column 9, line 47 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]JPH0561129 ; | [Y]JPH0756134 ; | [AD]JPH04141648 ; | [A]JPH06160886 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930713), vol. 17, no. 372, Database accession no. (P - 1573), & JP05061129 A 00000000 (TAMRON CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 95, no. 6, & JP07056134 A 19950303 (KODO EIZO GIJUTSU KK) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920903), vol. 16, no. 418, Database accession no. (P - 1413), & JP04141648 A 19920515 (SEIKO) [AD] 1,6-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940907), vol. 18, no. 481, Database accession no. (P - 1797), & JP06160886 A 19940607 (FUJITSU) [A] 8 * abstract * |