EP0791975 - Contacting of a flat antenna conductor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deininger, Jürgen Schwabstrasse 44 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Lotterer, Norbert Weinbergstrasse 20 72800 Eningen / DE | [1997/35] | Application number, filing date | 97101602.7 | 03.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | DE1996105999 | 17.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19605999 | [1997/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0791975 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0791975 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791975 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, H01R13/24 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
H01Q1/1271 (EP,US);
H01R13/2421 (EP);
H01R13/2442 (EP);
H01R13/245 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R2201/02 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/35] | H01Q1/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/35] | Title | German: | Kontaktierung einer flächigen Antennenleiterstruktur | [1997/35] | English: | Contacting of a flat antenna conductor structure | [1997/35] | French: | Connexion de strucure d'antenne platte | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 12.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2649650 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3604437 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 4, lines 29-67; figures 2-7 *; | [DA]DE3523228 (OPEL ADAM AG) [DA] 1 * column 5, lines 2-59; figures 2-5 * | by applicant | DE3604437 | DE3523228 | DE4232746 | DE4125999 |