EP0857981 - Base station of a remote interrogation system with a voltage and phase controlled oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [1998/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nandra, Navraj La Russie 11 2525 Le Landeron / CH | 02 /
Roz, Thierry Vy-d'Etra 30 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Balsters, Robert, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A., 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 97101812.2 | 05.02.1997 | [1998/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857981 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857981 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/00, G01S13/02, H03L7/06 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL | Title | German: | Basisstation eines Fernabfragesystems mit spannungsgesteuertem und phasengeregeltem Oszillator | [1998/33] | English: | Base station of a remote interrogation system with a voltage and phase controlled oscillator | [1998/33] | French: | Station de base d'un système d'interrogation à distance comprenant un oscillateur commandé en tension et asservi en phase | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.2002 | IE | 11.12.2002 | BE | 28.02.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/01] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
IE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 11.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08172378 ; | [A]US4169260 (BAYER ROBERT S) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US4388524 (WALTON CHARLES A [US]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 55 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9116696 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE], et al) [A] * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 22; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0625832 (STOBBE ANATOLI [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 53; figure 5 *; | [A]DE4430360 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 49; figure 2 * * column 6, line 51 - line 68 *; | [Y]EP0722155 (SONY CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 12 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0730071 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 29; figure 6; claims 1,5 *; | [A]DE19546171 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 5; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08172378 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] * abstract * |