EP0790633 - Method of operating an electron source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/34] | Electron source and electron beam-emitting apparatus equipped therewith | ||
[2001/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuhara, Satoru 397-12, Inada Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101980.7 | 07.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | JP19960049666 | 14.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4966696 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790633 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790633 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790633 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/073, H01J1/30 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
H01J37/06 (EP,US);
H01J2237/06316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Elektronenquelle | [2001/18] | English: | Method of operating an electron source | [2001/18] | French: | Procédé de mise en oeuvre d'une source d'électrons | [2001/18] |
Former [1997/34] | Elektronenquelle und Elektronenstrahlgerät mit einer solchen Elektronenquelle | ||
Former [1997/34] | Electron source and electron beam-emitting apparatus equipped therewith | ||
Former [1997/34] | Source d'électrons et dispositif à faisceau d'électrons utilisant une telle source | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5449968 (TERUI YOSINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 12-38; figures 1-3 * * claims 1,3,4 * [A] 3; | [A]EP0696043 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US3846663 (KOMODA T) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [DA]US4324999 (WOLFE JOHN E) [DA] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]JPH0836981 ; | [PA]JPH08171879 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960206), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08036981 A 00000000 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960702), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08171879 A 00000000 (HITACHI LTD) [PA] * abstract * |