EP0795668 - Arrangement for controlling a plurality of actuators in a central locking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnus, Oliver, Dipl.-Ing. Dorfstrasse 8 29393 Gross Oesingen / DE | 02 /
Katzwinkel, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Neue Strasse 2 38527 Meine / DE | [1997/38] | Application number, filing date | 97102174.6 | 12.02.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | DE1996109753 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19609753 | [1997/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795668 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795668 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/36 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
E05B77/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1997/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Anzahl von Aktuatoren einer Zentralverriegelungseinrichtung | [1997/38] | English: | Arrangement for controlling a plurality of actuators in a central locking apparatus | [1997/38] | French: | Arrangement pour controller une pluralité d'actionneurs dans un dispositif de verrouillage centralisé | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0491095 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2494534 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4801812 (BRUSASCO ENZO [IT]) [X] 1,3-5 * column W * | by applicant | EP0118001 | DE3628706 |