EP0790034 - Portable vital signs monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tavori, Itzhak P.O. Box 434 46103 Herzlia B / IL | [1997/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97102255.3 | 12.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | US19960601641 | 14.02.1996 Original published format: US 601641 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790034 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790034 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | [1999/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790034 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/1112 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B2505/09 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0242 (EP,US);
A61B2562/166 (EP,US);
A61B5/6801 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/34] | Title | German: | Tragbares Gerät zur Überwachung von Lebenszeichen | [1997/34] | English: | Portable vital signs monitor | [1997/34] | French: | Appareil portable de surveillance de signes vitaux | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 28.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2000 | 28.02.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2001 | 28.02.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2002 | 29.02.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0553372 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,12,13 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 40 * * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 56 * * column 13, line 11 - column 14, line 53; figures 1,2 * [Y] 10,14-16; | [X]US4909260 (SALEM ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 44 * * column 8, line 45 - line 62 * * abstract *; | [YA]US5474090 (BEGUN S J [US], et al) [Y] 15,16 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 40 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 34 * * abstract * [A] 1,6,14; | [A]US4827943 (BORNN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6,9,14 * column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 2 * * column 11, line 11 - column 12, line 68; figures 1,8 *; | [A]EP0314844 (VITACOMM LIMITED [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5385474 (BRINDIS CHARLES [US]) [A] 14 * the whole document * | [XY] - R.SAVATA, "THE MODERN MEDICAL BATTLEFIELD: SEQUITUR ON ADVANCED MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY", IEEE ROBOTICS & AUTOMATION MAGAZINE, (19940901), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 21 - 25, XP000471440 [X] 1,10 * page 22, column 2, lines 5-9; page 23, columns 1 and 2. * [Y] 10,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/100.296450 |