EP0791316 - Metal profile for constructing frames with corner joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erich Keller AG Romanshornstrasse 17 8583 Sulgen / CH | [1999/13] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states Erbslöh Aktiengesellschaft Siebeneicker Strasse 235 42553 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosch, Karl Magdalenenstrasse 12 42111 Wuppertal / DE | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat., et al Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1998/46] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat. Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Postfach 12 50 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1998/42] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1997/35] | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H.-D. Ernicke Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97102340.3 | 13.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | DE1996203258U | 23.02.1996 Original published format: DE 29603258 U | [1997/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791316 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/14, F16S3/02 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
F16S3/00 (EP);
A47B96/14 (EP);
B21C35/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/35] | Title | German: | Metallprofil für die Bildung von Rahmenwerken mit Eckverbindungen | [1997/35] | English: | Metal profile for constructing frames with corner joints | [1997/35] | French: | Profilé métallique pour la construction de cadres avec des éléments du coin | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/30] | 22.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9319206U (ERBSL¯H GMBH & CO) [AD] 1; | [A]DE9316037U (MEISTER) [A] 1; | [A]DE4306877 (ZIEGLER GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 |