EP0792855 - Process and device for decomposing organic wastes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GmbH Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6 65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Messer Griesheim GmbH Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6 65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Frankfurt Airport Center 1, C9, Hugo-Eckener-Ring D-60547 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böckler, Thomas Büdericherweg 8 47807 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, Hans-Rudolf Oberbruchstrasse 51 47807 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Beutler, Hans-Josef Bröhlstrasse 15 47669 Wachtendonk / DE | [1997/36] | Application number, filing date | 97102409.6 | 14.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | DE1996107305 | 27.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19607305 | [1997/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0792855 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0792855 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C05F17/00, C05F17/02 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
C05F17/00 (EP);
C05F17/979 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verrottung von organischen Abfällen | [1997/36] | English: | Process and device for decomposing organic wastes | [1997/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la décomposition de déchets organiques | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/44] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5277814 (WINTER JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim - * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 5 * * column 7, line 17 - column 7, line 67 *; | [X]GB2199820 (BOC GROUP PLC) [X] 1,3,5,6 * claim - * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3 *; | [A]DE2520640 (RENOVA ABFALLHYGIENE GMBH & CO) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4172034 (CARLSSON CARL G H [SE], et al) [A] 1-8 |