EP0790049 - Wheelchair and method for controlling the assist power of a power assist wheelchair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/34] | Wheelchair | ||
[2003/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchiyama, Atsushi C/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K., 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Ogata, Hiroaki C/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K., 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97102419.5 | 14.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | JP19960027040 | 14.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2704096 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790049 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790049 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790049 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/04 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
A61G5/045 (EP,US);
A61G5/048 (EP,US);
A61G5/1054 (EP,US);
A61G5/02 (EP,US);
Y10S180/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Rollstuhl und Methode zur Steuerung des Hilfsantriebs | [2003/13] | English: | Wheelchair and method for controlling the assist power of a power assist wheelchair | [2003/13] | French: | Fauteuil roulant et methode de contrôle pour un moteur auxiliaire | [2003/13] |
Former [1997/34] | Rollstuhl | ||
Former [1997/34] | Wheelchair | ||
Former [1997/34] | Fauteuil roulant | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.10.2003 | NL | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/41] | NL | 01.10.2003 | |
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0687454 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 31 - column 10, line 18 * * column 12, line 48 - column 14, line 56; figures 1-13,16-18 *; | [A]US5234066 (AHSING TERRY P [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 2; figures 1,4,10 * |